NETBALL DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Netball Development Trust (NDT) is a charity registered in the UK and based in London. We are a netball coaching programme that is active at the grass roots level in some of the least developed regions of the world. Our aim is to introduce the game of netball to boys and girls who lack access to sports facilities, opportunities, kit and equipment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ghana
- Kenya
- Pakistan
- Uganda
Governance
- 13 February 2012: Standard registration
- NDT (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simone Mahalia Shephard | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Melanie Elizabeth Davies | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shantonu Kumar Chundur | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|||||
JULIE SMITH | Trustee | 30 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
LIZ BROOMHEAD | Trustee | 13 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
MAINKA THANDI | Trustee | 13 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.60k | £9.85k | £7.45k | £23.24k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.18k | £8.50k | £5.26k | £12.09k | £17.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 27 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 29 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 26 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 26 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 03 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION, OR ASSISTANCE OF PROVISION, OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, IN PARTICULAR NETBALL, AMONG CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE IN AFRICA AND ASIA (TO BEGIN WITH) WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 South Road
Edmonton
London
N9 7JG
- Phone:
- 07737512145
- Email:
- NETBALLTRUST@HOTMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window