Financial history COMBERTON PLAYGROUND PROJECT

Charity Number: 1147824
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2013 31/05/2014 31/05/2015 31/05/2016 31/05/2017
Total gross income £16.51k £13.30k £8.62k £229 £1
Total expenditure £396 £20.13k £12.53k £4.59k £90
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A