Accounts and annual returns FRIENDS OF REGENT FARM

Charity Number: 1146514
Charity reporting is overdue by 1749 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 14 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 288 days
Annual return 14 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 654 days
Annual return 14 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1019 days
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1019 days
Annual return 14 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1384 days
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1384 days
Annual return 14 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1749 days
Accounts and TAR 14 October 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1749 days