HIGH PEAK GYMNASTICS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The promotion of community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for gymnastics. We promote both recreational membership to work towards the UK Gymnastics awards as well as competitive membership guiding the preparation for the UK Levels and competitions.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 31 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher George William Wrigley | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Keira Beth Plant | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Megan Amy Coverley | Trustee | 12 June 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.76k | £91.66k | £66.47k | £90.00k | £90.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £64.25k | £88.90k | £69.00k | £74.05k | £76.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 190 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 556 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 581 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 June 2024 | 581 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 May 2024 | 936 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2020
(These accounts |
24 May 2024 | 936 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2023 | 908 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 27 April 2023 | 908 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04 DEC 2010 AS AMENDED ON 01/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE THE PROMOTION OF COMMUNITY PARTICIPATION IN HEALTHY RECREATION IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR GYMNASTICS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Harpur Hill Sports Centre
Trenchard Drive
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 9JY
- Phone:
- 07904817899
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window