Financial history GRACELAND MINISTRIES INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1146067
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.39k £549 £898 £1.89k £1.03k
Total expenditure £1.32k £2.67k £3.09k £1.61k £981
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A