Financial history CHRISTIAN FAITH MINISTRIES FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1146452
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.87k £248 £1.74k £1.21k £1.44k
Total expenditure £677 £668 £1.61k £1.13k £1.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A