Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. WILFRID, MOBBERLEY

Charity Number: 1146680
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £345.70k £86.18k £103.06k £91.19k £87.07k
Total expenditure £135.44k £350.93k £134.59k £135.52k £108.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k £1.50k