Trustees SOUTHPORT OFFSHORE RESCUE TRUST
Charity number: 1146805

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Parkes | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
John Justin Felice | Trustee | 28 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Almond | Trustee | 22 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA DAWN GOLDUP | Trustee | 29 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
ANTONY WILLIAM TOPPING | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Alan John Porter | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICHOLAS DAVID PORTER | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KATHLEEN WILSON | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY MASTERS | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
KEITH ANDREW PORTER | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN SHAWCROFT | Trustee | 31 March 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.