ASSISTED READING FOR CHILDREN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity's aim is to impart a love of reading to disadvantaged primary school children via regular, personalised, mentoring support from trained volunteers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £7,851 from 7 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
230 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 07 March 2012: Standard registration
- 05 April 2012: Funds received from 1124632 ASSISTED READING FOR CHILDREN IN OXFORDSHIRE
- ARCH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CURTIS LEUNG | Trustee | 09 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Robert Morel-Allen | Trustee | 19 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Elizabeth Williamson | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
MARGARET JANE STEVENS | Trustee | 08 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN DONALD HUDSPETH | Trustee | 07 December 2021 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.57k | £166.48k | £135.05k | £144.12k | £158.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £126.78k | £134.37k | £134.30k | £149.51k | £176.77k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £6.89k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £13.39k | £26.37k | £6.89k | £3.77k | £7.85k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 09 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 03 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND SELF-CONFIDENCE OF CHILDREN IN OXFORDSHIRE, PARTICULARLY BY HELPING THEM TO OVERCOME READING DIFFICULTIES, THEREBY PROMOTING THEIR SELF-ESTEEM AND GENERAL WELLBEING.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GOBLES COURT
7 MARKET SQUARE
BICESTER
OXON
OX26 6AA
- Phone:
- 01869320380
- Email:
- info@archoxfordshire.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window