THE CHURCH ESTATE,BISHOPTHORPE

Charity Number: 502619
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Receive rents from charity owned land (including 3 riverside moorings) and dividend income from investments. Utilise for the upkeep thereof and for the benefit of St. Andrews Church, Bishopthorpe.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023

Total income: £14,784
Total expenditure: £5,135

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • City Of York

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 August 1973: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE FEOFFEES OF ST ANDREW'S CHURCH BISHOPTHORPE (Working name)
  • THE CHURCH ESTATE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Denise Quinn Trustee 07 August 2023
None on record
Graham Swales Trustee 02 April 2023
None on record
Jeremy Boxall Trustee 03 March 2020
None on record
Andrene Watson Trustee 31 January 2017
None on record
CAROLE ANN GREEN Trustee
None on record
IAN ARTHUR JEMISON Trustee
ST ANDREW'S READING ROOM
Received: On time
Martin David Sutton Trustee
ST HELEN'S BELL FUND CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST ANDREW BISHOPTHORPE
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £7.49k £7.22k £7.22k £7.63k £14.78k
Total expenditure £3.50k £11.67k £11.67k £6.11k £5.14k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 20 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 31 August 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2021 29 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2019 04 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
48 MAIN STREET
BISHOPTHORPE
YORK
YO23 2RB
Phone:
01904701133
Website:

No information available