IVATT DIESEL RECREATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To build and operate a diesel railway locomotive to class D16/1
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Scotland
Governance
- 27 April 2012: Standard registration
- LMS10000 (Working name)
- WWW.LMS10000.ORG (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tony Ellershaw | Chair | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Bullock | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Langley | Trustee | 08 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Caddy | Trustee | 19 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Brown | Trustee | 19 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michael Prince | Trustee | 28 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Andrew John Hoseason | Trustee | 19 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paul Etherington | Trustee | 24 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £39.52k | £62.98k | £90.48k | £128.49k | £47.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.30k | £50.32k | £68.77k | £96.91k | £25.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 23 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 02 April 2021 | 153 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17/09/2011 as amended on 01 Sep 2018 as amended on 28 Dec 2023 as amended on 28 Dec 2023
Charitable objects
1) TO BUILD, PRESERVE, OPERATE, MAINTAIN AND EXHIBIT THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO AN LMS DIESEL LOCOMOTIVE TO ENGINE DIAGRAM 279 TWO OF WHICH WERE ORIGINALLY CONSTRUCTED IN 1947 AND KNOWN AS THE "IVATT TWINS" AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN PIONEERING DIESEL TRACTION IN THE UK. 2) TO USE THE CHARITY'S PROPERTY TO PROMOTE PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE, APPRECIATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE HISTORICAL EDUCATIONAL SCIENTIFIC AND CULTURAL ASPECTS OF THE TRUST PROPERTY WITH PARTICULAR REGARD TO ITS HISTORICAL SIGNIFICANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
46 Biddick Village Centre
WASHINGTON
NE38 7NP
- Phone:
- 07551621685
- Email:
- info@LMS10000.co.uk
- Website:
-
lms10000.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window