MOISHE HOUSE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Moishe House has received grants during the current financial year from various individuals and institutions. With these grants they intend to be able to achieve their current objectives. The activities that Moishe House undertakes are for public benefit and are charitable according to English Law.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 February 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gideon Zev Smith | Chair | 15 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Max Kreimerman | Trustee | 15 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Shane | Trustee | 29 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £367.04k | £295.92k | £394.76k | £265.44k | £266.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £368.39k | £257.68k | £261.56k | £110.07k | £536.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 08 November 2023 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 01/12/2011
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO ADVANCE THE JEWISH FAITH, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY AMONGST YOUNG ADULTS BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO EXPLORE AND DEEPEN THEIR UNDERSTANDING, KNOWLEDGE AND PRACTICE OF JUDAISM.
Contact information
- Address:
-
First Floor
Winston House
349 Regents Park Road
LONDON
N3 1DH
- Phone:
- 07748711546
- Email:
- NAAMA.ZOHAR@MOISHEHOUSE.ORG
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window