HONESTY & CO-OPERATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organization plan to run home work tuition class for KS2-KS3 age group, Pensioner and elderly club. Also, the organization managed to help poor people in Nigeria.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
Governance
- 26 April 2012: Standard registration
- HC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOHAMMED LAWAN MODU TELA | Chair | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDULKADIR DALA | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDULLAH ALI | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/03/2020 | 30/03/2021 | 30/03/2022 | 30/03/2023 | 30/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £1.63k | £1.34k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £2.05k | £1.76k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 March 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2023 | 11 February 2025 | 378 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2022 | 24 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2021 | 17 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 March 2020 | 29 March 2021 | 58 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/10/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 21/04/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND IN NIGERIA AND IN PARTICULAR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES: 1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, IN PARTICULAR THOSE LIVING IN LONDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, BY THE PROVISION OF SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION CLASSES FOR STUDENTS WHO ARE UNDERACHIEVING IN MAINSTREAM EDUCATION. 2) TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FLAT 289
GREENAN COURT
6 MEATH CRESCENT
LONDON
E2 0QF
- Phone:
- 07946499234
- Email:
- COOPANDHONESTY@GMAIL.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window