GWYNFI AFFILIATED SPORTS PROJECT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of GASP is to promote community participation in healthy recreation in particular by the provision of facilities for the playing of sports for the benefit of the inhabitants of Blaengwynfi and Abergwynfi.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Neath Port Talbot
Governance
- 08 August 2012: Standard registration
- GASP (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHARON LEWIS | Chair | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
EDEL CATHERINE Mcintyre | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEAN LEWIS | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
EMMA LOUISE TRAHAR | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
JOHN BYRON EVANS | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
RODERICK GUY JOHNSTONE MCINTYRE | Trustee | 29 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2019 | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £541 | £8.15k | £0 | £1.71k | £39.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £317 | £1.00k | £102 | £5.31k | £39.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 23 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 11 March 2025 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 388 days | |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 21 June 2023 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 30 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 30 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10/06/2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF GASP IS TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN THE ELECTORAL WARD OF GWYNFI.
Area of benefit
THE ELECTORAL WARD OT GYNFI
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Jersey Road
Blaengwynfi
Port Talbot
SA13 3TB
- Phone:
- 07870273170
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window