ALL SAINTS KINGSTON DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has been formed to carry forward the refurbishment and development of the historic Church of All Saints, Kingston upon Thames. As from 1 January 2013 it has taken on (by a deed of transfer) the assets, liabilities and activities of the All Saints Parish Church Kingston upon Thames Appeal Fund (registered charity 1080671).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Kingston Upon Thames
Governance
- 12 April 2012: Standard registration
- 26 July 2013: Funds received from 1080671 ALL SAINTS PARISH CHURCH KINGSTON UPON THAMES APPE...
- ASK (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KEVIN JOHN DAVIS | Chair | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Keith Long | Trustee | 09 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
John Edward Dewhurst | Trustee | 03 January 2017 |
|
|||||
PENELOPE ANNE D'SOUZA | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
Philip Walker | Trustee | 15 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.32k | £15.33k | £19.58k | £8.81k | £3.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £60.54k | £85.03k | £42.17k | £8.45k | £732 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 182 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 548 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 913 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 13 November 2020 | 13 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 29/11/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10/04/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT:- 1) TO RESTORE REPAIR MAINTAIN IMPROVE EXTEND BEAUTIFY RECONSTRUCT AND MANAGE THE CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS KINGSTON UPON THAMES (THE CHURCH) IN THE DIOCESE OF SOUTHWARK AND IN THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND THE MONUMENTS FITTINGS FIXTURES STAINED GLASS FURNITURE ORNAMENTS AND CHATTELS IN THE CHURCH AND THE CHURCHYARD BELONGING TO THE CHURCH; 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECTS OF HISTORY AND HERITAGE IN RELATION TO ISSUES OF LOCAL AND NATIONAL IMPORTANCE IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT LIMITED TO THE HISTORY AND HERITAGE OF THE SITE AND SURROUNDINGS IN WHICH THE CHURCH IS LOCATED; AND 3) TO BENEFIT THE RESIDENTS OF KINGSTON UPON THAMES AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE, OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER SUCH RESIDENTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND/OR LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH RESIDENTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
All Saints Church
Market Place
Kingston upon Thames
KT1 1JP
- Phone:
- 02083909203
- Email:
- kevin@kevindavis.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window