BELIEF IN MEDIATION AND ARBITRATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of education, mediation, arbitration and advocacy to members of the public for disputes where religious faith is relevant to one or more of the parties and/or the dispute between them.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 May 2012: Standard registration
- BIMA (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SPENSER HILLIARD | Chair | 06 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR ZAZA JOHNSON ELSHEIKH | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
ROGER LEVITT | Trustee | 21 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.47k | £350 | £250 | £630 | £390 | |
|
Total expenditure | £395 | £660 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 21 August 2024 | 198 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 02 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18/01/2012 AS AMENDED ON 04/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF THE PEACEFUL RESOLUTION OF DISPUTES AMONG MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC WHERE RELIGIOUS BELIEF IS RELEVANT EITHER TO THE DISPUTANTS OR TO THE SUBJECT MATTER OF THE DISPUTE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROVIDING MEDIATION AND ARBITRATION SERVICES, SO AS TO AVOID OR REDUCE THE NEED FOR, AND THEREBY TO RELIEVE THE SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC COSTS OF, LITIGATION.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE BASE
DARTFORD BUSINESS PARK
VICTORIA ROAD
DARTFORD
DA1 5FS
- Phone:
- 01322314820
- Email:
- zaza@bimagroup.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window