Accounts and annual returns INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY NORTH EAST

Charity number: 1148607
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 19 November 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 November 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 10 November 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 08 February 2021 8 days late Download Open in new window