INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY NORTH EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity aim and mission statement is 'to enable the voices of vulnerable people in North Tyneside to be heard, through the provision of a range of independent advocacy services, tailored to the needs of the individual'. The main objectives and activities focus on the provision of case advocacy and citizen advocacy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £243,117 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Tyneside
Governance
- 16 August 2012: Standard registration
- 04 September 2012: Funds received from 1049624 INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY (NORTH TYNESIDE)
- IANT (Working name)
- INDEPENDENT ADVOCACY NORTH TYNESIDE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Blight | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Woolmore | Trustee | 25 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise Fisher | Trustee | 22 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Barrow | Trustee | 21 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dennis Errington | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £248.53k | £258.80k | £245.68k | £251.16k | £288.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £280.87k | £274.29k | £222.34k | £261.14k | £262.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £199.79k | N/A | N/A | £239.20k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £156.09k | £243.40k | N/A | £243.12k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 09/07/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16/10/2013 as amended on 27 Mar 2024 as amended on 21 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS ARISING THERE FROM TO PERSONS IN OR OF THE BOROUGH OF NORTH TYNESIDE (HEREINAFTER CALLED "THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE PROVISION OF ADVOCACY SERVICES, ADVICE, INFORMATION AND SUPPORT IN ORDER TO GAIN ACCESS TO EDUCATIONAL, ECONOMIC, HEALTH, HOUSING, LEISURE, SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER SERVICES. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT AS ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Linskill Centre
Linskill Terrace
North Shields
Tyne & Wear
NE30 2AY
- Phone:
- 01912596662
- Email:
- info@iane.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window