Financial history Ahava Community

Charity number: 1148286
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £538.73k £1.24m £1.20m £830.55k £662.07k
Total expenditure £695.48k £1.03m £1.47m £1.01m £734.64k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £20.00k £275.79k £280.51k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £171.87k £677.01k £28.40k £217.66k £85.95k
Income - Other trading activities £16.71k £108.81k £338.35k £271.75k £349.01k
Income - Charitable activities £350.16k £449.90k £524.32k £341.14k £227.10k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £83 £5 £3 £14
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £48.79k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £687.94k £927.22k £1.17m £679.80k £518.36k
Expenditure - Raising funds £7.54k £101.77k £121.56k £130.46k £69.52k
Expenditure - Governance £1.78k £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £2.51k £180.06k £202.64k £146.76k