VICTORY CHRISTIAN CENTRE ASSEMBLIES OF GOD - SLOUGH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
?We help members of the public and charity members to practice Christianity in Slough ?We encourage ethnic Minority Groups and Identities in Slough to get involve ? We provide educational sponsorship for orphans in West Africa (0-12years) ? We organise music therapy to public around the world ? We provide Children, Youth and vulnerable adults a place to connect, reflect and relax
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bracknell Forest
- Slough
- Algeria
- Angola
- Argentina
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Belgium
- Benin
- Botswana
- Brazil
- Burkina Faso
- Burundi
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Croatia
- Denmark
- Dominican Republic
- Eswatini
- Finland
- France
- Gabon
- Germany
- Ghana
- Greece
- Guinea
- Haiti
- India
- Ireland
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Liberia
- Libya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Mali
- Mexico
- Morocco
- Namibia
- New Zealand
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Poland
- Portugal
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- The Gambia
- Togo
- United States
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 24 May 2012: Standard registration
- VCC AOG SLOUGH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
STEPHEN BAFFOUR | Chair | 15 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA TOLBERT | Trustee | 01 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
HELINA DONKOR | Trustee | 19 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.10k | £31.42k | £5.68k | £17.85k | £16.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.21k | £41.82k | £8.33k | £14.77k | £16.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 09/12/2007
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: A) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT B) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AND TO PROMOTE AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH BY THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, GOODS OR SERVICES OF ANY KIND AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UK OR THE WORLD AS THE CHURCH COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Sovereign Heights
Slough
SL3 8PY
- Phone:
- 07702459304
- Email:
- stephenbgyau@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
WWW.SLOUGHVCCOAG.CO.UK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window