PICKERING AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a small society struggling to get recognition in a difficult area. 112 above covers our interests.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 23 August 1973: Standard registration
- PICKERING AND DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY (Working name)
- PICKERING DISTRICT CIVIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Eden Blyth | Trustee | 11 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
HILDA SISSONS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STUART ALEXANDER HARRISON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MIKE POTTER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN FRANCIS ADDYMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.40k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 06 August 2024 | 188 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JUNE 1973 AS AMENDED 30 APRIL 2001
Charitable objects
A) TO STIMULATE PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. B) TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT. C) TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN AREA OF BENEFIT.
Area of benefit
PICKERING RD
Contact information
- Address:
-
VIVERS MILL HOUSE
MILL LANE
PICKERING
YO18 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01751747979
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window