FRIENDS OF HALFWAY HOUSES PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1146169
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

School social activities: Discos, Fetes, bingos, craft fairs, leavers ball, easter egg hunt, BBQ

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £17,444
Total expenditure: £12,866

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Kent

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 February 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Natalie Deacon Trustee 17 September 2024
None on record
Rebecca Hoggins Trustee 01 March 2023
None on record
Clare Louise James Trustee 21 November 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £6.29k £4.62k £9.11k £15.43k £17.44k
Total expenditure £9.97k £5.70k £6.04k £13.76k £12.87k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 21 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 05 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 12 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 23 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 14 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Halfway Houses Primary School
Danley Road
Minster on Sea
SHEERNESS
ME12 3AP
Phone:
01795 662875