ESCAPE INTERVENTION SERVICES LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Escape Intervention Services provides counselling, complementary therapies, anger/stress management, family mediation and activities for young people aged 4-25 years and their parents/carers in South Tyneside.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- South Tyneside
Governance
- 29 October 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PHILIP COX | Chair | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
NICOLA GINA CRAMER | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA JANE JONES | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
MALCOLM PAYNE | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE RUSHTON | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £180.59k | £193.33k | £95.67k | £202.50k | £175.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £157.32k | £151.91k | £145.44k | £163.06k | £201.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 27 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 16 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 January 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 FEB 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04/10/2012
Charitable objects
A)TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF YOUNG PEOPLE AND THEIR PARENTS IN SOUTH TYNESIDE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF ADVICE, COUNSELLING AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT. B)TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN SOUTH TYNESIDE BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (I) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (III) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (IV) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Waverley
South Shields
NE33 1LE
- Phone:
- 01914276353
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window