FIREFLY CANCER AWARENESS AND SUPPORT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The principal objects of the charity are the promotion and protection of the physical and mental health of cancer sufferers and their carers through the provision of support, education and practical advice throughout South Yorkshire & Bassetlaw.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Doncaster
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 14 May 2012: Standard registration
- 28 February 2024: Funds received from 1179872 DONCASTER BUSINESS FOR THE COMMUNITY
- FIREFLY CLUB (Working name)
- FIREFLY CANCER AWARENESS AND SUPPORT CIC (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Barbara Lister | Trustee | 19 February 2024 |
|
|||||
Francesca Polson | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Linda Monks | Trustee | 20 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bacchus | Trustee | 23 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAUL TAYLOR | Trustee | 22 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £353.18k | £274.43k | £347.18k | £323.62k | £461.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £319.81k | £303.27k | £295.47k | £393.17k | £384.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 27 June 2024 | 119 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 07 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31 DEC 2009 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 03/05/2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO CARRY ON ACTIVITIES WHICH BENEFIT THE COMMUNITY AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT LIMITATION) TO:- 1.1 PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF SUFFERERS OF CANCER AND THEIR CARERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF SUPPORT, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE 1.2 ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN ALL AREAS RELATING TO CANCER. 1.2 THIS PROVISION MAY BE AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION BUT ONLY WITH THE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Castlegate
Tickhill
Doncaster
DN11 9QU
- Phone:
- 07515632897
- Email:
- ianbacchus@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window