VILLAGE HOPE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our aim is to proclaim and live out the gospel of Jesus Christ in the villages of Britain, in order to establish effective Christian witness. We seek to encourage and enable village churches in Bible teaching, prayer, worship and evangelism.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 March 2012: Standard registration
- 15 June 2023: Funds received from 1167320 PRIOR'S FROME CHAPEL
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Plumb | Chair | 06 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Elizabeth Bagwell | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Jenny Esdaile Woods | Trustee | 03 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Rev Samuel Peter Brinkley | Trustee | 20 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Simon Peter Carruthers | Trustee | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.45k | £27.14k | £33.49k | £23.57k | £20.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £115.79k | £113.03k | £89.50k | £83.85k | £60.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/04/1970 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 20/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 25/01/2012
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO "PROCLAIM AND LIVE OUT THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST IN THE VILLAGES OF BRITAIN, IN ORDER TO ESTABLISH EFFECTIVE CHRISTIAN WITNESS, AND TO ENCOURAGE AND ENABLE BIBLE TEACHING, PRAYER, WORSHIP AND EVANGELISM IN VILLAGE CHURCHES."
Contact information
- Address:
-
VILLAGE HOPE
Chapel
Dormington
Priors Frome
HEREFORD
HR1 4EP
- Phone:
- 01600 719724
- Email:
- villagehope@villagehope.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window