Financial history PIAI LIMITED

Charity number: 1146259
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017
Total gross income £5.00k £3.00k £150 £0 £0
Total expenditure £4.86k £245 £48 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £0 £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £0 £0