HATFIELD PEVEREL INFANT & NURSERY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1146536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fundraising such as Family Fun Day, children's parties, cake sales and craft afternoons to support Hatfield Peverel Infant School, Essex.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £10,505
Total expenditure: £2,765

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 March 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • HPISA (Working name)
  • HATFIELD PEVEREL INFANT SCHOOL ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Zoe Fairbairn Chair 25 September 2024
None on record
Amelia Kourris-Simmons Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Suzanne Goody Trustee 19 October 2022
None on record
Pauline Dalziel Smith Trustee 17 September 2019
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.96k £3.17k £13.48k £9.75k £10.51k
Total expenditure £1.71k £1.34k £5.53k £2.81k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 27 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 20 July 2023 20 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 18 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hatfield Peverel
County Infant School
Church Road
Hatfield Peverel
CHELMSFORD
CM3 2RP
Phone:
01245380220
Website:

No information available