HATFIELD HOUSE CHAMBER MUSIC FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1147891
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

OUR ACTIVITIES RELATE TO OUR OBJECTIVES TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND APPRECIATION OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF MUSIC AND SIMILAR ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BY MEANS OF PRESENTING AN ANNUAL MUSIC FESTIVAL AND OTHER EVENTS. THESE INCLUDE THE DESIGN, MARKETING AND PRESENTATION OF MUSICAL AND OTHER ARTS EVENTS. MOST EVENTS TAKE PLACE AT HATFIELD HOUSE ESTATE

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £77,357
Total expenditure: £87,555

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Hertfordshire
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 June 2012: Standard registration
  • 01 December 2019: Funds received from 283428 HATFIELD AND DISTRICT MUSIC FESTIVAL
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • HATFIELD HOUSE MUSIC FESTIVAL (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Edward Graham Blakeman Chair 04 January 2024
None on record
Maja Wegrzynowska Trustee 22 April 2024
None on record
Allan Arthur Trustee 11 July 2023
None on record
Elizabeth Barbara Fagg Trustee 13 December 2022
THE HARPENDEN MUSIC FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Lord Charles Edward Vere Cecil Trustee 05 November 2018
STEFANOU FOUNDATION
Received: On time
MARY MOSELEY Trustee 26 February 2015
THE CONFRATERNITY OF SAINT JAMES
Received: 213 days late
NICK MOORHOUSE Trustee 03 June 2012
WATFORD FOODBANK AND COMMUNITY RELIEF TRUST
Received: On time
BOB BOAS Trustee 03 June 2012
THE FIDELIO CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
AMSCORDI LIMITED
Received: On time
THE NATIONAL LIFE STORY COLLECTION
Received: On time
THE NICHOLAS BOAS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £68.85k £60.59k £91.60k £94.93k £77.36k
Total expenditure £73.89k £54.72k £89.86k £92.34k £87.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.20k £2.40k £3.08k £11.69k N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 23 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 17 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 20 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 12 February 2021 104 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 12 February 2021 104 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Hatfield House
Hatfield
Hertfordshire
AL9 5NQ
Phone:
07853275542
Website:

hatfieldhousemusicfestival.org.uk