THE WITHAM HALL LIMITED

Charity Number: 1146726
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THE CHARITY ACTIVITIES PROVIDE THEATRICAL AND MUSICAL ENTERTAINMENT, TALKS BY LOCAL PEOPLE, EDUCATIONAL CLASSES THROUGH THE ADULT LEARNING SCHEME. BALLET AND DANCE CLASSES ARE HELD FOR YOUNGER CHILDREN AS WELL AS THEATRICAL TRAINING. SPORTS AND KEEP FIT ACTIVITIES FORM AN IMPORTANT PART OF OUR ACTIVITIES. REVENUE IS EARNED FROM ROOM HIRE AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES TO EXTERNAL ORGANISATIONS.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £430,253
Total expenditure: £454,115

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 June 1999: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE WITHAM (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kenneth Robert John Walker Trustee 31 March 2025
None on record
Christopher Edward Armstrong Trustee 01 February 2025
None on record
Amanda Elizabeth Bromley Mrs Trustee 22 April 2024
NCFE
Received: On time
Ian Wilson Smith Trustee 09 October 2023
None on record
Josephine Margaret Turnbull Trustee 04 September 2023
None on record
Gordon Alistair Duffy-McGhie Trustee 27 February 2023
None on record
Nicola Mary Grace Trustee 13 April 2022
None on record
NORMAN PETER HODGES Trustee 13 April 2022
BARNARD CASTLE SCHOOL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £536.38k £385.52k £375.11k £388.11k £430.25k
Total expenditure £502.99k £301.40k £333.12k £394.97k £454.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £44.39k £177.39k £107.23k £14.26k £66.50k
Income - Donations and legacies £49.81k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £199.39k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £286.60k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £578 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £343.52k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £159.47k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 02 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 16 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 July 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 03 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME SEALED 15TH DECEMBER 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 27 MAY 2010. AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED ON 24 SEP 2019 AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 12 APR 2022
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND THE INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, TO PROMOTE SCIENCE, ART, LITERATURE AND THE SPREAD OF KNOWLEDGE AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR: (A) MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND (B) OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS (2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE COMMITTEE FOR THE USE FOR THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 19 June 1999 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
The Witham
3 Horsemarket
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 8LY
Phone:
01833631107