Accounts and annual returns CARERS ANONYMOUS ANIMAL REFUGE SANCTUARY
Charity number: 1147495

Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 08 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 173 days | |
Annual return | 08 January 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 264 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2023 | 29 July 2024 | 264 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 08 January 2022 | 12 July 2023 | 246 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2021 | 12 July 2023 | 611 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 08 January 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 08 January 2020 | 14 March 2023 | 856 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
08 January 2020
(These accounts |
14 March 2023 | 856 days late | Download Open in new window |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window