ST ANNA'S CHILDREN'S HOME

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity helps to home 14 children and provide eduction to 240 children in Ghana.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Ghana
Governance
- 09 May 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MISS LARA ANN DE KLEE | Chair | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr GABRIELLE ANTONIO HAIGH HAIGH | Trustee | 02 April 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.15k | £15.57k | £23.86k | £17.66k | £14.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.65k | £22.75k | £30.95k | £20.95k | £120.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 29 February 2024 | 63 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 12 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 August 2022 | 233 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/02/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 08/05/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ABANDONED OR ORPHANED CHILDREN UP TO THE AGE OF 16 LIVING IN GHANA BY THE PROVISION OF ACCOMMODATION AND CARE IN A SAFE AND SECURE ENVIRONMENT. 2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN AND YOUNG PEOPLE LIVING IN GHANA BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR EDUCATION AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS OF THE TRUSTEES MAY DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Hilltop Cottage
Marridge Hill
Ramsbury
MARLBOROUGH
SN8 2HG
- Phone:
- 07896602509
- Email:
- hello@stannas.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window