THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST HEDGE END

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
regular public worship, provision of sacred spaces for personal prayer & contemplation, pastoral work,teaching Christianty, taking of religious assemblies in school, provision of children/youth group, promotion of Christianity through the staging of events and meetings, distribution of leaflets, promoting the whole mission of the church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

16 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 June 2012: Previously excepted registration
- 14 November 2013: Funds received from 203814 CHARITY OF ISABELLA SARA BLENNERHASSETT
- ST JOHN'S HEDGE END (Working name)
- ST JOHN THE EVENGELIST HEDGE END (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Philip Aindow | Chair | 30 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine Carol Aindow | Trustee | 23 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael John Furnell | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Diane Hawkins | Trustee | 04 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Derek Clark | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Susan Watson | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Moore | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David William Lloyds | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Louise James | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Taylor | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Nicholas James | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
William James Sambrook | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter John Reynolds | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Malcolm John Thornton | Trustee | 23 April 2015 |
|
|||||
MARSHA ALBERTA HALE | Trustee | 15 June 2012 |
|
|
||||
DAVID ERNEST DIMMICK | Trustee | 20 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £112.25k | £172.13k | £86.38k | £73.44k | £87.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £105.80k | £92.58k | £94.05k | £92.63k | £95.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 13 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 01 JAN 1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PARISH OFFICE
Underhill Centre
76 St. Johns Road
Hedge End
SOUTHAMPTON
SO30 4AF
- Phone:
- 01489 790048
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window