THE LINKUP ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 11 October 1973: Standard registration
- 21 August 2008: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- LINKUP OR LINKUP CHRISTIAN LITERATURE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2004 | 31/01/2005 | 31/01/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £77.41k | £24.51k | £55.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £27.26k | £29.00k | £57.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2006 | 30 November 2006 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2006 | 30 November 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 January 2005 | 01 December 2005 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2005 | 01 December 2005 | 1 days late | |
Annual return | 31 January 2004 | 17 December 2004 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2004 | 17 December 2004 | 17 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 DECEMBER 1972 AS AMENDED 26 SEPTEMBER 1973
Charitable objects
TO TELL THE GOSPEL AND TO SEEK TO WIN OTHERS TO A SAVING KNOWLEDGE OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST IN BRUTON-ON-TRENT DISTRICT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE THE CONSTITUTION)
Area of benefit
BURTON-ON-TRENT AND DISTRICT
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window