THE QUAY PLAYERS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Quay Players was established as an amateur musical theatre group in 1997. We are affiliated to the National Operatic and Dramatic Association (NODA). We rehearse at St. Anne's church hall, Thorburn Square, London SE1 every Tuesday, 7.30pm-9.30pm, and generally perform two shows a year: a pantomime at Christmas and a musical in July, plus regular cabarets and open music nights.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Greenwich
- Lambeth
- Lewisham
- Southwark
Governance
- 07 June 2012: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mark Adam Smith | Chair | 28 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Louise Murray | Trustee | 03 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Plews | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Emma Bowker | Trustee | 27 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.32k | £23.77k | £294 | £40.79k | £70.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.46k | £15.34k | £846 | £15.52k | £40.04k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 77 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 15 September 2024 | 77 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 19 July 2023 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 September 2021 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 28 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11/01/2011 AS AMENDED ON 30/07/2013
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS AND TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Quay Players
c/o St Anne's Church Hall
Thorburn Square London
London
SE1 5QH
- Phone:
- 07763283449
- Email:
- info@quayplayers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window