Governing document COMMUNITY PROJECTS CENTRE (CWMBRAN) LIMITED
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 JULY 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS OF 18 FEBRUARY 1985, 25 JUNE 1996, 17 OCTOBER 2005 AND 3 FEBRUARY 2010.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITIES OF WALES, AND IN PARTICULAR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN CWMBRAN AND THE SURROUNDING NEIGHBOURHOOD AND IN PARTICULAR: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE FURTHERANCE OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, DISTRESS AND SICKNESS AND (B) THE PROVISION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID COMMUNITIES.
Area of benefit
CWMBRAN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.