THE GERRICK ROSE ANIMAL TRUST

Charity Number: 1146252
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To relieve the suffering of animals in need of care and attention, in particular but not exclusively in Devon and Cornwall, by providing grants, donations, funding and any other form of support as the trustees may from time to time determine.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £224,291
Total expenditure: £190,337

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 March 2012: Standard registration
  • 06 June 2012: Funds received from 1123647 THE GERRICK ROSE ANIMAL TRUST
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jacqueline Anne Davis Trustee 01 June 2023
None on record
David McGinnes Forrester Lorimer Trustee 04 November 2021
None on record
CHERYL MARIE THOMAS Trustee 22 February 2012
None on record
JEAN CLARISSA KNUCKEY Trustee 22 February 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £209.77k £226.69k £224.47k £249.97k £224.29k
Total expenditure £211.19k £110.32k £143.78k £156.89k £190.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 17 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 17 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 24 March 2022 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 24 March 2022 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 06 February 2021 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 04 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Coliza Crest
Trelowth
St Austell
Cornwall
PL26 7DX
Phone:
07930 875 932