THE AIRBORNE INITIATIVE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Airborne Initiative Trust is a registered charity whose objective is to develop the character and good citizenship of young people who are offenders or at risk of becoming offenders. It does this by arranging 5 day courses on Dartmoor for 18 to 20 year olds as an alternative to custody.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karin Cardiff | Trustee | 29 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Peter Philip Rogers | Trustee | 01 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Alistair M C Rogers | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Prudence Mary Keely Davies | Trustee | 16 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Kate Adie | Trustee | 01 December 2017 |
|
|||||
General Sir Rupert Anthony Smith | Trustee | 16 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
BUFFY SACHER | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £25.55k | £3.38k | £987 | £488 | £360 | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.92k | £4.00k | £3.97k | £8.39k | £6.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
3.1 THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS (OBJECTS) ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE UNITED KINGDOM: 3.1.1 FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES OF THE AIRBORNE FORCES CHARITIES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE; 3.1.2 TO DEVELOP THE CHARACTER OF AND LASTING QUALITIES OF CIVIC RESPONSIBILITY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP AMONG YOUNG OFFENDERS, YOUNG EX-OFFENDERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK OF OFFENDING; 3.1.3 TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT OR ORGANISE THE RECRUITMENT AND TRAINING OF ANY YOUNG OFFENDERS, YOUNG EX-OFFENDERS AND YOUNG PEOPLE AT RISK OF OFFENDING AND TO ASSIST THEM IN FINDING SUITABLE EDUCATION, TRAINING, EMPLOYMENT OR ACCOMMODATION WITH A VIEW TO REHABILITATION, SOCIAL INCLUSION AND THE PREVENTION OF CRIME; AND 3.1.4 TO FURTHER SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL CONSIDER FROM TIME TO TIME TO BE WITHIN THE PRINCIPAL PURPOSES OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED, IN PRACTICE REGIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Woodswater Lane
Beaminster
DT8 3DU
- Phone:
- 01308862712
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
airborneinitiative.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window