WEST OF ENGLAND RURAL NETWORK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As a specialist rural organisation we work with communities, businesses, social enterprises, groups and individuals to support and encourage community-led action. We are experienced in areas such as broadband, access to services, transport, affordable housing, fuel poverty, energy generation, village halls & community assets, health & social care, funding advice and community led planning.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £150,746 from 5 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 29 February 2012: Standard registration
- WERN (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Matthew Riddle | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wildblood | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|||||
Edith Whittingham | Trustee | 14 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
SAMANTHA ROSS | Trustee | 16 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Laura Penny | Trustee | 12 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
GEORGIE BIGG | Trustee | 27 February 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £215.04k | £275.20k | £392.29k | £405.90k | £337.34k | |
|
Total expenditure | £233.03k | £238.15k | £270.58k | £372.20k | £406.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £15.62k | £88.03k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £57.33k | £37.34k | £77.44k | £245.48k | £150.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 13 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13/02/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN THE WEST OF ENGLAND (BEING AN AREA SERVED BY THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS OF NORTH SOMERSET, BATH & NORTH EAST SOMERSET, BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE, HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT) AND IN PARTICULAR THAT OF THE RELIEF OF THOSE IN NEED, BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE, THE ADVANCEMENT OF CITIZENSHIP OR COMMUNITY DEVELOPMENT, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR BY PURSUING ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
THE WEST OF ENGLAND BEING THE ADMINISTRATIVE AREAS OF NORTH SOMERSET, BATH & NORTH EAST SOMERSET, BRISTOL AND SOUTH GLOUCESTERSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
5th Floor
Mariner House
62 Prince Street
BRISTOL
BS1 4QD
- Phone:
- 01275333701
- Email:
- info@wern.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window