Financial history KEMP HOSPICE

Charity number: 1146310
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.89m £2.15m £2.02m £1.74m £1.92m
Total expenditure £1.70m £1.50m £1.64m £1.69m £1.96m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £277.76k £832.92k £344.30k £292.98k £298.25k
Income - Donations and legacies £864.70k £748.97k £829.52k £623.88k £737.68k
Income - Other trading activities £739.82k £366.36k £751.27k £795.90k £804.65k
Income - Charitable activities £281.36k £643.20k £357.71k £310.28k £310.09k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £2.89k £1.33k £1.51k £14.15k £66.14k
Income - Other £0 £394.33k £81.73k £0 £0
Income - Legacies £98.21k £55.00k £14.10k £243.54k £17.20k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £763.46k £711.37k £730.90k £777.83k £955.49k
Expenditure - Raising funds £938.71k £777.19k £913.01k £915.60k £1.01m
Expenditure - Governance £0 £13.89k £0 £17.53k £13.77k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £109 £9.12k £0 £534 £0