SOUTHERN DOMESTIC ABUSE SERVICE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Southern Domestic Abuse Service provides inclusive services services to women, children, young people & men affected by domestic abuse. Services include: Refuge accommodation, Community based outreach services, IDVA Services, Women only group work, Specialist work with children/young people, FGM Community Work/Development, work with perpetrators, domestic abuse preventative work and training.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£8,779,726
Donations and legacies | £14.79k | |
Charitable activities | £8.54m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £226.01k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,405,683
Raising funds | £9.60k | |
Charitable activities | £7.40m | |
Other | £21 |
£20,132 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £4,167,427 from 4 government contract(s) and £1,122,893 from 17 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.40m | |
Retained for future use | £1.37m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £9.62k | |
Charitable expenditure | £7.40m | |
Retained for future use | £1.39m |
People

180 Employee(s)
8 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
One or more of the employees were formerly trustees
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Hampshire
- Portsmouth City
- Southampton City
- West Sussex
Governance
- S.D.A.S. (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GILL BUTLER | Chair | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Maria Rose Griffiths | Trustee | 13 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lauren Parrett | Trustee | 28 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Stakes | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|||||
MARGARET ANN POIL | Trustee | 31 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
CLAIRE GODWIN | Trustee | 19 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY OSGOOD | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JULIA MUNDAY | Trustee | 13 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.46m | £5.60m | £6.57m | £7.96m | £8.78m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.30m | £4.07m | £4.67m | £6.34m | £7.41m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £2.26m | £2.47m | £3.25m | £4.34m | £4.17m | |
|
Income from government grants | £850.19k | £1.83m | £1.11m | £815.19k | £1.12m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £48.47k | £85.91k | £90.25k | £64.71k | £14.79k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £4.40m | £5.51m | £6.48m | £7.88m | £8.54m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £2.99k | £1.97k | £489 | £16.51k | £226.01k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.30m | £4.07m | £4.66m | £6.31m | £7.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.02k | £2.91k | £14.54k | £23.38k | £9.60k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £29.86k | £99.14k | £51.21k | £204.79k | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £191.52k | £223.47k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £3.02k | £2.91k | £3.65k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £222 | -£1.88k | £1 | £21 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £153.22k | £164.95k | £213.06k | £242.55k | £1.03m | |
|
Long-term investments | £242.21k | £293.91k | £342.71k | £326.37k | £2.14m | |
|
Other assets | £2.54m | £4.15m | £5.93m | £7.77m | £6.44m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £342.29k | £434.55k | £410.78k | £645.73k | £515.27k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 01 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 21 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 05/02/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY IS ESTABLISHED FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES ONLY: 1.TO IMPROVE THE PROTECTION AVAILABLE TO THE VICTIMS OR POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE (MEANING PHYSICAL, SEXUAL, EMOTIONAL, PSYCHOLOGICAL, MENTAL AND/OR FINANCIAL ABUSE WITHIN AN INTIMATE OR FAMILY RELATIONSHIP); 2. TO WORK TOWARDS THE PREVENTION OF DOMESTIC ABUSE THROUGH PUBLIC AWARENESS AND EDUCATION; 3.TO PROVIDE A HIGH QUALITY OF SERVICE AND SUPPORT FOR VICTIMS OR POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE; 4. TO PROVIDE RELIEF FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE BEEN VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE; 5. TO PROVIDE SUPPORT AND REFUGE ACCOMMODATION FOR VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE OR OF A PATTERN OF COERCIVE AND CONTROLLING BEHAVIOUR, INCLUDING FORCED MARRIAGE AND VICTIMS OF SO-CALLED ?HONOUR? CRIMES; 6. TO FURTHER THE STUDY OF THE CAUSES AND CONSEQUENCES OF DOMESTIC ABUSE; 7. TO PROVIDE SERVICES AND SUPPORT FOR ALL VICTIMS OR POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE. IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS THE CHARITY MAY; 8.PROVIDE REFUGE ACCOMMODATION FOR VICTIMS OR POTENTIAL VICTIMS OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND THEIR DEPENDANTS WHO, BY REASON OF THEIR DOMESTIC CIRCUMSTANCES, ARE IN THE OPINION OF THE CHARITY IN NEED OF TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION TO ENSURE THEIR SAFETY AND PHYSICAL AND/OR MENTAL WELL-BEING; 9. PROMOTE, SPONSOR, FACILITATE, ENCOURAGE AND/OR UNDERTAKE RESEARCH AND EXPERIMENTAL PROJECTS IN RELATION TO DOMESTIC ABUSE; 10. ADVANCE AND PROMOTE PUBLIC EDUCATION AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ISSUES OF DOMESTIC ABUSE AND DOMESTIC VIOLENCE; 11.PROVIDE ASSISTANCE, FINANCIAL OR OTHERWISE TO THIRD PARTIES; 12.SOLICIT, OBTAIN, COLLECT AND RECEIVE MONEY AND RESOURCES BY WAY OF CONTRIBUTIONS, DONATIONS, LEGACIES GRANTS AND ANY OTHER LAWFUL METHOD AND ACCEPT AND RECEIVE GIFTS AND BEQUESTS OF PROPERTY OF ANY DESCRIPTION (WHETHER SUBJECT TO ANY SPECIAL TRUST OR NOT); 13.PROCURE AND PROVIDE GENERAL INFORMATION RELATING TO DOMESTIC ABUSE; 14.PROCURE TO BE WRITTEN AND PRINT, PUBLISH, ISSUE AND CIRCULATE IN PAPER OR ELECTRONIC FORM, GRATUITOUSLY OR OTHERWISE, REPOST, PERIODICALS, BOOKS, PAMPHLETS, LEAFLETS OR OTHER DOCUMENTS; 15.CARRY OUT SUCH LAWFUL ACTS AS MAY BE CONDUCTIVE TO FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO BOX 53
HAVANT
HAMPSHIRE
PO9 1UA
- Phone:
- 023 9200 8329
- Email:
- info@stopdomesticabuse.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window