Intercultural Roots for Traditional Embodied Arts

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Operating globally, activities include: (educational) learning material development; exchanges, performances; teacher training; classes, workshops, retreats and courses; collaborative embodied research laboratories; (arts) research, preservation, sustainment and dissemination; (hardship relief) the provision of grants, goods or services. Resourcing and administering funded projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Abu Dhabi
- Afghanistan
- Ajman
- Akrotiri
- Aland Islands
- Albania
- Algeria
- American Samoa
- Andorra
- Angola
- Anguilla
- Antarctica
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Argentina
- Armenia
- Aruba
- Ascension
- Australia
- Austria
- Azerbaijan
- Bahrain
- Baker Island
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belgium
- Belize
- Benin
- Bermuda
- Bhutan
- Bolivia
- Bonaire
- Bosnia And Herzegovina
- Botswana
- Bouvet Island
- Brazil
- British Antarctic Territory
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Bulgaria
- Burkina Faso
- Burma
- Burundi
- Cambodia
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cape Verde
- Cayman Islands
- Central African Republic
- Ceuta
- Chad
- Chile
- China
- Christmas Island
- Cocos (KEELING) ISLANDS
- Colombia
- Comoros
- Congo
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
- Cook Islands
- Costa Rica
- Croatia
- Cuba
- Cyprus
- Czech Republic
- Denmark
- Dhekelia
- Djibouti
- Dominica
- Dominican Republic
- Dubai
- Easter Island
- East Timor
- Ecuador
- Egypt
- El Salvador
- Equatorial Guinea
- Eritrea
- Estonia
- Eswatini
- Ethiopia
- Falkland Islands
- Faroe Islands
- Fiji
- Finland
- France
- French Guiana
- French Polynesia
- French Southern Territories
- Fujairah
- Gabon
- Georgia
- Germany
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Greece
- Greenland
- Grenada
- Guadeloupe
- Guam
- Guatemala
- Guernsey
- Guinea
- Guinea-bissau
- Guyana
- Haiti
- Heard Island And Mcdonald Islands
- Honduras
- Hong Kong
- Howland Island
- Hungary
- Iceland
- India
- Indonesia
- Iran
- Iraq
- Ireland
- Isle Of Man
- Israel
- Italy
- Ivory Coast
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Jarvis Island
- Jersey
- Johnston Atoll
- Jordan
- Kazakhstan
- Kenya
- Kingman Reef
- Kiribati
- Kosovo
- Kuwait
- Kyrgyzstan
- Laos
- Latvia
- Lebanon
- Lesotho
- Liberia
- Libya
- Liechtenstein
- Lithuania
- Luxembourg
- Macau
- Macedonia
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Mali
- Malta
- Marshall Islands
- Martinique
- Mauritania
- Mauritius
- Mayotte
- Melilla
- Mexico
- Micronesia
- Midway Islands
- Moldova
- Monaco
- Mongolia
- Montenegro
- Montserrat
- Morocco
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- Navassa Island
- Nepal
- Netherlands
- New Caledonia
- New Zealand
- Nicaragua
- Niger
- Nigeria
- Niue
- Norfolk Island
- Northern Ireland
- Northern Mariana Islands
- North Korea
- Norway
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
- Oman
- Pakistan
- Palau
- Palmyra Atoll
- Panama
- Papua New Guinea
- Paraguay
- Peru
- Philippines
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Poland
- Portugal
- Puerto Rico
- Qatar
- Ras Al-khaimah
- Réunion
- Romania
- Russia
- Rwanda
- Saba
- Saint Barthélemy
- Saint Helena
- Saint-Martin
- Saint Pierre And Miquelon
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- San Marino
- São Tomé And Principe
- Saudi Arabia
- Scotland
- Senegal
- Serbia
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Sint Eustatius
- Sint Maarten
- Slovakia
- Slovenia
- Solomon Islands
- Somalia
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- South Korea
- South Sudan
- Spain
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Sudan
- Suriname
- Svalbard And Jan Mayen
- Sweden
- Switzerland
- Syria
- Taiwan
- Tajikistan
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Togo
- Tokelau
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Tristan Da Cunha
- Tunisia
- Turkey
- Turkmenistan
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Ukraine
- Umm Al-quwain
- United Arab Emirates
- United States
- United States Virgin Islands
- Uruguay
- Uzbekistan
- Vanuatu
- Vatican City
- Venezuela
- Vietnam
- Wake Island
- Wallis And Futuna
- Western Sahara
- Yemen
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 28 March 2012: Standard registration
- THE TEDDY BALDOCK SPORTS BENEVOLENT FUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Charles Patrick Royal | Trustee | 30 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alvaro Ivan Hernandez Rodriguez | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alex Boyd PHD | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Andrea Lucia Maciel Rodrigues PHD | Trustee | 27 February 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN SAX | Trustee | 24 February 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.16k | £1.90k | £5.09k | £14.13k | £21.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.19k | £7.66k | £1.93k | £17.38k | £20.61k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 02 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 19 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 10 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 JAN 2012 AS AMENDED ON 26 SEP 2018 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 FEB 2019
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ON THE SUBJECT OF TRADITIONAL AND INDIGENOUS EMBODIED ARTS AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN ALL ASPECTS OF THAT SUBJECT AND TO PUBLISH THE USEFUL RESULTS; 2) TO ADVANCE THE CULTURAL HERITAGE OF TRADITIONAL AND INDIGENOUS EMBODIED ARTS TO BENEFIT PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD THROUGH RESEARCH, PRESERVATION, SUSTAINMENT AND DISSEMINATION; 3) TO RELIEVE HARDSHIP IN INDIGENOUS COMMUNITIES WORLDWIDE, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, INCLUDING THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS, GOODS OR SERVICES; 4) TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, OF MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY, OR STRESS AND OF HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE WHO ARE INVOLVED OR WERE FORMERLY INVOLVED IN THE PLAYING OF ALL SPORTS INCLUDING BOXING WHO BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY, DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH RELIEF; AND 5) TO ADVANCE THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION AND HEALTH OF BOTH CHILDREN AND ADULTS BY ENCOURAGING AND ASSISTING THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES AND FACILITIES FOR THE PLAYING OF ALL SPORTS AT ALL LEVELS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Herb Cottages
Bridgwater Road
Bleadon
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS24 0BA
- Phone:
- 07753611768
- Email:
- hello@interculturalroots.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window