HELSTON RAILWAY PRESERVATION SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Restoration of the Helston Railway Branch Line
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
80 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Cornwall
Governance
- 30 March 2012: Standard registration
- HRPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tim Childs | Chair | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
William Ross Whitten | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Tisdale | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Moore | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michael Charles Pyers | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
PETER KENNAN | Trustee | 23 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Les Jones | Trustee | 22 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Geoff Childs | Trustee | 02 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £34.42k | £55.71k | £31.95k | £47.57k | £74.76k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.27k | £24.72k | £11.97k | £43.28k | £37.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 17 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 07 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 16 January 2021 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 16 January 2021 | 18 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15 FEB 2012 AS AMENDED ON 29/03/2012 AS AMENDED ON 29 NOV 2017 as amended on 16 Oct 2024
Charitable objects
1) TO FACILITATE THE RENOVATION AND PRESERVATION OF ALL FORMS OF RAILWAY LOCOMOTIVE POWER, ROLLING STOCK AND ANCILLARY EQUIPMENT, PLATFORM, BUILDINGS, INFRASTRUCTURE AND TRACK AT THE HELSTON RAILWAY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND 2)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE RAILWAY HISTORY, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THE HELSTON RAILWAY, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF A HERITAGE CENTRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Helston Railway
Trevarno Farm
Prospidnick
Helston
Cornwall
TR13 0RY
- Phone:
- 07901977597
- Email:
- barbara@helstonrailway.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window