WALSALL DEAF COMMUNITY SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Centre for sign language users and the provision of services & facilities for people with other disabilities. We support both deaf & hard of hearing people in the West Midlands.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dudley
- Staffordshire
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- WALSALL DEAF PEOPLE'S CENTRE (WDPC) (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 30/09/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £186.73k | £131.76k | £155.29k | £155.29k | £82.87k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.86k | £141.50k | £168.36k | £168.36k | £278.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £74.12k | £34.95k | £38.86k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £34.95k | £38.86k | £3.40k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 September 2020 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 11 September 2020 | 43 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2018
(These accounts |
29 January 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
30 January 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 13 DEC 2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 29/05/2012 as amended on 26 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
4.1 To relieve the need of disabled people, in particular but not exclusively deaf persons by, 4.1.1 providing services which help the deaf community in England and Wales to live as normal and independent lives as possible and to achieve their ambitions; 4.1.2 to maintain a centre for social activities for the deaf community, other disability and community organisations, and to empower deaf and disabled people to organise their own activities, 4.1.3 to teach British Sign Language and other skills which will assist the social inclusion of deaf people, and 4.1.4 to strive to find better ways to give deaf and disabled people a full role in society and to work with other organisations and societies to achieve that purpose
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window