Financial history OUR LADY OF LOURDES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1146532
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £80.30k £80.11k £99.92k £81.13k £127.32k
Total expenditure £89.34k £73.84k £88.59k £88.36k £100.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £61.55k £59.84k £62.42k £92.18k