OUR LADY OF LOURDES PRE-SCHOOL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pre-School education for 2 to 4 year olds
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
Total income includes £92,182 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 22 March 2012: Standard registration
- 09 February 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 24 June 2019: Re-registered
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Stacey Keal | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Weston | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lee Weston | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chloe Chan | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ebony Louise Coleman | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Robbins | Trustee | 11 October 2022 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.30k | £80.11k | £99.92k | £81.13k | £127.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £89.34k | £73.84k | £88.59k | £88.36k | £100.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £61.55k | £59.84k | £62.42k | £92.18k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | 11 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 16 September 2024 | 78 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2023 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 13 December 2023 | 166 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 379 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 13 December 2023 | 531 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 28 September 2021 | 90 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2022 | 330 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 14 OCT 2011
Charitable objects
THE AIMS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL ARE TO ENHANCE THE DEVELOPMENT AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE BY ENCOURAGING PARENTS TO UNDERSTAND AND PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF THEIR CHILDREN THROUGH COMMUNITY GROUPS AND BY: (A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY, EDUCATION AND CARE FACILITIES, FAMILY LEARNING AND EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN WHATEVER THEIR RACE, CULTURE, RELIGION, MEANS OR ABILITY (B) ENCOURAGING THE STUDY OF THE NEEDS OF SUCH CHILDREN AND THEIR FAMILIES AND PROMOTING PUBLIC INTEREST IN AND RECOGNITION OF SUCH NEEDS IN THE LOCAL AREAS (C) INSTIGATING AND ADHERING TO AND FURTHERING THE AIMS AND OBJECTS OF THE PRE-SCHOOL LEARNING ALLIANCE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 COURT ROAD
KINGSWOOD
BRISTOL
BS15 9QB
- Phone:
- 01179872027
- Email:
- ololpreschool@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window