THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST STEPHEN, NORWICH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Medieval church building with recently refurbished interior. Sunday services: 9.15am and 10.45am. Morning Prayer 9.30am Mon-Fri. Cafe serves food and drinks Mon-Sat 10am-3pm. The church can be hired on a not-for-profit basis for concerts, Christian & secular charity events & conferences.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
76 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 15 June 2012: Previously excepted registration
- 13 May 2022: Funds received from 263842 ST STEPHEN'S CHURCH TRUST ESTATES
- ST STEPHEN'S PCC, NORWICH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alaine Amy Apphia Constance-Caidence Mukene-Drew | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lynne Elizabeth Daniels | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adam John Curtis | Trustee | 28 April 2024 |
|
|||||
Janet Susan Terry | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Aimee-Marie Taylor Gedge | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Olufunnke Abidemi Olugboji | Trustee | 14 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Luscombe | Trustee | 26 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Terry | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Abigail Elizabeth Walter-Browne | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID DAYNES | Trustee | 08 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Ian Charles Fifield | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Humphreys | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Frederick Tracey Gilbert | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Peter Martin Ferdinand Emmrich | Trustee | 18 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sue Stapleford Pink | Trustee | 22 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £277.65k | £207.21k | £261.17k | £281.16k | £323.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £345.00k | £258.02k | £274.03k | £276.44k | £329.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £24.79k | £20.20k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 13 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 14 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 09 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02 JAN 1957
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Stephens Church
Rampant Horse Street
NORWICH
NR2 1QP
- Phone:
- 01603617697
- Email:
- admin@ststephensnorwich.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window