MIRANDA BENNION CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For the public benefit, focusing on promotion of the arts and relief of sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHARLES RICHARD BENNION SOLICITOR | Chair | 06 March 2012 |
|
|||||
GEORGINA CHILD | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JESSICA DE PREE | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
Dr Polly Wilkinson DOCTOR | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
||||
JUDY BENNION | Trustee | 06 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.00k | £6.06k | £6.80k | £16.05k | £17.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.00k | £13.50k | £12.00k | £20.50k | £16.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 February 2024 | 7 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 19 February 2023 | 14 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 17 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: 1) FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF HIGH STANDARDS OF DRAMA, BALLET, MUSIC, SINGING, LITERATURE, SCULPTURE, PAINTING, CINEMA AND OTHER PERFORMING AND REPRESENTATIONAL ARTS AS PROVIDED THROUGH, FOR EXAMPLE, THEATRES, CINEMAS AND CONCERT HALLS, CHOIRS, ORCHESTRAS, MUSIC, OPERATIC AND DRAMATIC SOCIETIES, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO: A) AWARDING TO PEOPLE UNDER THE AGE OF 25 SCHOLARSHIPS, MAINTENANCE, ALLOWANCES OR GRANTS TENABLE AT ANY UNIVERSITY, COLLEGE OR INSTITUTION OF HIGHER OR FURTHER EDUCATION; AND B) ENABLING THE UNDERTAKING OF TRAVEL IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT EDUCATION OR TO PREAPRE FOR ENTRY TO ANY OCCUPATION, TRADE OR PROFESSION ON LEAVING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLSIHMENT. 2) TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND POOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUI[MENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES. 3) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Frewin Road
LONDON
SW18 3LR
- Phone:
- +447788740941
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window