SACRED HEART CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL (NEW MALDEN) PSA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the pupils of Sacred Heart Catholic Primary School, Burlington Road, New Malden, KT3 and to connect them with the wider local community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 21 February 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Merton
Governance
- 16 March 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Samantha Claire Dekker | Chair | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Irene Custodio | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniela Magliocchetti | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Gabriela Yvette Avila | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Siobhan George Eagle | Trustee | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 21/02/2019 | 21/02/2020 | 21/02/2021 | 21/02/2022 | 21/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £29.98k | £33.51k | £14.99k | £23.60k | £31.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.03k | £30.66k | £15.82k | £32.16k | £26.92k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 21 February 2023 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2023 | 30 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 February 2022 | 05 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 February 2021 | 16 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 21 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 21 February 2019 | 15 September 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 21 February 2019 | 15 September 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 22 FEB 2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS AT SACRED HEART CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL, NEW MALDEN, BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES, NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY, FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sacred Heart RC Primary School
Burlington Road
NEW MALDEN
KT3 4ND
- Phone:
- 02089420215
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window