THE COUNTY OF LANCASTER RIFLE ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2006
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England
Governance
- 17 April 1974: Standard registration
- 09 March 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- C L R A (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2004 | 31/12/2006 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.58k | £8.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.97k | £6.74k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | 19 February 2008 | 111 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES REVISED AT THE AGM JANUARY 1968, 1972 AND AMENDED 24 FEBRUARY 1974.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE INTEREST IN FULL BORE RIFLE SHOOTING AND IN PARTICULAR AMONGST: A. RIFLE CLUBS AND MEMBERS. B. MEMBERS OF COMBINED CADET FORCES ATTACHED TO NORTHERN SCHOOLS. C. LANCASHIRE UNITS OF THE TERRITORIAL ARMY AND VOLUNTEER RESERVE AND OTHER UNITS OF HER MAJESTY'S ARMED FORCES STATIONED IN THE COUNTY.
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF LANCASTER AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window