Financial history THE DORCAS PROJECT

Charity Number: 1149228
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/07/2018 07/07/2019 07/07/2020 07/07/2021 07/07/2022
Total gross income £834 £4.60k £1.21k £1.33k £446
Total expenditure £605 £2.03k £1.12k £1.13k £2.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A